OR SB684 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies requirements for covered entities that own, license, maintain, store, manage, collect, process, acquire or otherwise possess personal information, and for vendors that provide services to covered entities, to notify consumers of breach of security. Specifies exemptions for certain covered entities that are subject to other laws governing protections and disclosures.
Title
Relating to actions with respect to a breach of security that involves personal information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 180, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 5--Findley, Greenlick, Hayden, Keny-Guyer, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Rayfield, Williamson. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-23 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2019-04-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, Olsen. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |