OR SB683 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts to provide instruction on racist history of this country and state. Requires school districts to provide instruction on racist history of this country and state. Directs State Board of Education to adopt requirements for instruction. Directs Department of Education to convene advisory group for purposes of assisting State Board of Education in adopting requirements for instruction on racist history and recommending curricula. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to instruction on racist history; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Rob Wagner [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Golden [D] |
Sen. Katherine Lieber [D] | Sen. Charles Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB683 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB683/Introduced |