OR SB666 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Allows virtual public charter school to receive funding for providing supplemental online courses.
Title
Relating to public charter schools; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments (Printed A-Eng.) and subsequent referral to Finance and Revenue be rescinded and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. Subsequent referral to Finance and Revenue rescinded by order of the President. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Finance and Revenue, then Ways and Means. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |