OR SB648 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands duties of Central Oregon Health Council. Allows council to convene one community advisory council for all coordinated care organizations serving counties that join council. Requires report to Seventy-ninth Legislative Assembly. Extends sunset to 2022.
Title
Relating to Central Oregon Health Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Knute Buehler [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] | Rep. Val Hoyle [D] |
Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2016. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Chapter 359, 2015 Laws. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buehler. Passed.Ayes, 51; Absent, 1--Keny-Guyer; Excused, 1--McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Bentz, Buckley, Davis, Fagan, Hoyle, Vega Pederson, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 21, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-14 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-04-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |