OR SB644 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits contracting agency to directly appoint consultant to provide architectural, engineering, photogrammetric mapping, transportation planning or land surveying services if estimated value of services is less than $100,000.
Title
Relating to direct appointments for certain consulting services; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency. |
2013-04-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Devlin, Steiner Hayward. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |