OR SB641 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits denial of medical assistance on basis that individual under 19 years of age is in detention pending adjudication. Prohibits denial of medical assistance on basis that individual under 19 years of age is in detention pending adjudication. Requires Oregon Health Authority to seek federal approval for federal financial participation in costs of providing medical assistance to such individuals. Requires Oregon Health Authority to conduct study, in consultation and collaboration with directors of county juvenile departments, agencies working with juvenile justice and youth health care systems, directors of juvenile detention facilities, Department of Human Services and Oregon Youth Authority, of needs of and barriers to youth in detention in accessing medical assistance and health care services. Requires Oregon Health Authority to report on study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary no later than September 15, 2023.
Title
Relating to medical assistance for youth in preadjudication detention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |