OR SB634 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Parks and Recreation Department to convene advisory committee to assist department in researching and developing recommendations for changes to campsite administration and reservation process to improve access for service-disabled veterans. Directs State Parks and Recreation Department to convene advisory committee to assist department in researching and developing recommendations for changes to campsite administration and reservation process to improve access for service-disabled veterans. Requires department to submit report on results of advisory committee to Legislative Assembly by September 15, 2023. Sunsets January 2, 2025. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to reservations for use of state parks; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB634 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB634/Introduced |