OR SB626 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Quality Fresh Waters Program.
Title
Relating to the Quality Fresh Waters Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Atkinson [R] | Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Sen. Richard Devlin [D] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
Sen. Franklin Morse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Effective date, January 1, 2012. | |
2011-08-03 | Chapter 714, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-28 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-27 | President signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Atkinson, Boquist, Starr, Verger. | |
2011-06-22 | Third reading. Carried by Krieger. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 6--Freeman, Hicks, Schaufler, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-10 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-10 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-08 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-05-31 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the Co-Speaker. | |
2011-05-31 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-05-24 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-26 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Energy, Environment and Water. | |
2011-03-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-03-09 | Third reading. Carried by Morse. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-03-08 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-08 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-03-03 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-24 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-11 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. | |
2011-02-08 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |