OR SB616 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-22 - Vote explanation(s) filed by Dexter.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-22 - Vote explanation(s) filed by Dexter.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows holder of direct shipper permit to ship up to five cases of cider or malt beverages, each containing not more than nine liters, per month to Oregon resident. Allows holder of direct shipper permit to ship up to five cases of cider or malt beverages, each containing not more than nine liters, per month to Oregon resident.
Title
Relating to shipment of alcoholic beverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Dexter. |
2023-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Osborne. Failed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 30--Andersen, Boice, Bowman, Chaichi, Dexter, Gamba, Grayber, Hartman, Helfrich, Hieb, Levy B, Lively, Mannix, Marsh, Morgan, Nelson, Neron, Nguyen H, Owens, Pham H, Pham K, Reschke, Reynolds, Sanchez, Scharf, Smith G, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Wright; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Ruiz, Sosa. |
2023-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-11 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-05-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-04-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-04-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-13 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Small Business. |
2023-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 4--Hansell, Hayden, Sollman, Thatcher. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Carried over to 02-15 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Carried over to 02-14 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Carried over to 02-13 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |