OR SB616 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that State Treasurer may not recommend prudent maximum amount of lottery bonds that would cause combined existing and proposed lottery bond debt service to exceed 25 percent of unobligated net lottery proceeds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to debt service on lottery bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-03-14SenateRecommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-03-12SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-05SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Business and General Government, then Ways and Means.
2019-01-22SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback