OR SB610 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, June 26, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, June 26, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies definitions pertaining to assistance animals for purposes of accessing places of public accommodation and places of access to state government services, programs or activities and for purposes of cause of action for harm to assistance animal.
Title
Relating to assistance animals; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date, June 26, 2013. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 530, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 30. |
2013-06-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Dembrow. |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |