OR SB61 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, June 4, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, June 4, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases membership of Oregon Medical Board by one public member. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to public members of the Oregon Medical Board; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, June 4, 2019. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 228, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boles, Helm; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-07 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Boquist, Girod; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Carried over to 02-19 by unanimous consent. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |