OR SB608 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Effective date, February 28, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits landlord from terminating month-to-month tenancy without cause after 12 months of occupancy. Provides exception for certain tenancies on building or lot used by landlord as residence. Allows landlord to terminate tenancy with 90 days' written notice and payment of one month's rent under certain conditions. Exempts landlord managing four or fewer units from payment of one month's rent. Provides that fixed term tenancy becomes month-to-month tenancy upon ending date if not renewed or terminated. Allows landlord to not renew fixed term tenancy if tenant receives three lease violation warnings within 12 months during term and landlord gives 90 days' notice. Limits rent increases for residential tenancies to one per year. Limits maximum annual rent increase to seven percent above annual change in consumer price index. Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to publish maximum annual rent increase percentage. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to residential tenancies; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateEffective date, February 28, 2019.
2019-03-22SenateChapter 1, 2019 Laws.
2019-02-28SenateGovernor signed.
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-02-27SenatePresident signed.
2019-02-26HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Evans.
2019-02-26HouseThird reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 25--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Gomberg, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika.
2019-02-25HousePotential conflict(s) of interest declared by Helt.
2019-02-25HouseSecond reading.
2019-02-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-02-20HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2019-02-13HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-02-12SenateThird reading. Carried by Fagan, Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Winters; Excused, 2--Olsen, Thomsen.
2019-02-07SenateSecond reading.
2019-02-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-02-04SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Housing.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback