OR SB606 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Modernizing Grant Funding and Contracting. Sets minimum rate at which specified state agencies may compensate nonprofit organizations for indirect costs related to providing services.] Establishes Task Force on Modernizing Grant Funding and Contracting. Specifies membership of task force. Requires task force to examine how state's granting and public procurement practices limit wages of employees of nonprofit organizations and make recommendations to Oregon Department of Administrative Services concerning changes to state procurement practices that will support living wages for employees of nonprofit organizations, uniform application procedures for grant moneys, standard contracting language that permits flexibility in contract terms and conditions and multiyear contract terms, sufficient reporting requirements that are commensurate with funding levels and that allow for adequate lead time for changes to reporting required within term of contract, payment models that prioritize full cost recovery and mechanism for ongoing review and evaluation of grantmaking and procurement processes. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to compensation for nonprofit organizations that provide services on behalf of the state; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-15SenateEffective date, September 24, 2023.
2023-08-15SenateChapter 578, 2023 Laws.
2023-07-31SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-24SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-22HouseThird reading. Carried by Walters. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 15--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Osborne, Owens, Scharf, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 5--Boshart Davis, Diehl, Nguyen H, Reschke, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Morgan, Sosa.
2023-06-21HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 22, 2023 Calendar.
2023-06-21HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-21HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-20HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-20HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-06-20SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Anderson.
2023-06-20SenateThird reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 7--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-16SenateCarried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-12SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2023-06-09SenateWork Session held.
2023-06-06SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2023-06-06SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-05-31SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2023-04-11SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-04-11SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-04-03SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-12SenateReferred to Human Services, then Ways and Means.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB606
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24156
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25275
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25372
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66557
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263586
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263325
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268989
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269408
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268778
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77391
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77608
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78249
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78512
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275639
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275640
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275688
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275891
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275894
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80427
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80459
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80720
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80813
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35113
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36063
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=587668
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=588786

Bill Comments

feedback