OR SB606 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Effective date, August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extends dental pilot project by seven years. Appropriates moneys for pilot project. Makes dental services provider in pilot project eligible for reimbursement for services provided to medical assistance recipient. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to dental pilot project; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-13SenateEffective date, August 12, 2015.
2015-08-13SenateChapter 842, 2015 Laws.
2015-08-12SenateGovernor signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-07SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2015-07-02HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-07-01HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-07-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-01SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-30SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-06-29SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-23SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-23SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-06-03SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2015-04-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2015-04-06SenateWork Session held.
2015-03-16SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-02-10SenateReferred to Health Care, then Ways and Means.
2015-02-10SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB606
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB606/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21412
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23297
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363822
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364617

Bill Comments

feedback