OR SB604 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to establish program for purpose of providing to credentialing organizations access to information that is necessary to credential or recredential health care practitioners.
Title
Relating to credentialing of health care practitioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 603, 2013 Laws. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hanna, Unger. |
2013-06-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Carried over to 06-19 by unanimous consent. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |