OR SB599 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires landlord to allow dwelling to be used as family child care home, subject to conditions. Requires landlord to allow dwelling to be used as family child care home, subject to conditions. Authorizes Early Learning Council to establish rules for landlords.].
Title
Relating to use of rental unit as family child care home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2024. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Chapter 145, 2023 Laws. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 20--Boice, Cate, Conrad, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Evans, Goodwin, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Ruiz, Sosa. |
2023-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-11 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services. |
2023-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Girod declared potential conflict of interest. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner, Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 3--Findley, Girod, Linthicum. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Carried over to 02-15 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Carried over to 02-14 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |