OR SB583 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Alternative Fuel Vehicle Revolving Fund.
Title
Relating to alternative fuel vehicles; appropriating money; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-21 | Senate | Effective date, October 7, 2013. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Chapter 774, 2013 Laws. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 20--Barton, Berger, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Absent, 1--Garrett; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2013-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2013-07-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Starr. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Close, Ferrioli, Kruse, Whitsett; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |