OR SB579 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates exception under Death with Dignity Act to 15-day waiting period for patient with less than 15 days to live. Creates exception to two-day waiting period for patient with less than two days to live.
Title
Relating to death with dignity.
Sponsors
Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 624, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 22--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Lewis, Lively, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Bynum, Leif; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-06-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-06-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-28 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-05-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Gelser, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, President Courtney, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Heard, Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |