OR SB579 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state contracting agency that awards public improvement contract with contract price of more than $5 million to require contractor to employ apprentices to perform 10 percent of work hours on public improvement that workers in apprenticeable occupations perform. Increases apprentice employment requirement to 12 percent in 2020. Exempts Department of Transportation from requirement. Provides that state contracting agency shall pay contractor for imputed costs that contractor incurs in complying with requirement. Specifies reporting requirements for contractor and requires contractor to repay amounts that state contracting agency pays in excess of amount due contractor. Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to incentives for increasing apprentice utilization on public improvements for state contracting agencies; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB579 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB579/Introduced |