OR SB574 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases threshold under which school district may receive additional State School Fund moneys for student eligible for special education. Increases amount transferred each year to High Cost Disabilities Account. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to distributions from the State School Fund for students with disabilities; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB574 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB574/Introduced |