OR SB572 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospital to implement safe patient handling policy.
Title
Relating to the safe handling of hospital patients; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-31 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2013-05-31 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2013-05-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-01 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2013-04-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 22; nays, 7--Baertschiger, Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Olsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |