OR SB5703 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies amounts allocated from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to state agencies. Modifies amount of allocation] amounts allocated from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund for payment of lottery bond debt service obligations] to state agencies. Increases amounts allocated from Veterans' Services Fund. Increases amounts allocated from Criminal Fine Account. Authorizes additional uses for moneys allocated from Oregon Marijuana Account. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Effective date, April 10, 2018. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 107, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard. |
2018-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2018-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-03-03 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |