OR SB5702 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by state agencies. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 103, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith. Passed.Ayes, 37; Nays, 23--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson. |
2016-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Winters. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to Ways and Means to adopt the -A2 amendment failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 1--Winters. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |