OR SB5702 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits expenditures from federal funds collected or received by Department of Transportation for public safety broadband planning for six-year period beginning July 1, 2013. Adjusts, for six-year period beginning July 1, 2013, limitations on expenditures from specified sources collected or received by Oregon Department of Administrative Services for Public Utility Commission Building exterior replacement, HVAC improvement projects, Executive Building renovation and fire panel upgrades. Adjusts, for six-year period beginning July 1, 2013, limitations on expenditures from specified sources collected or received by Department of Community Colleges and Workforce Development for Cascades Hall at Central Oregon Community College. Adjusts, for six-year period beginning July 1, 2013, limitation on expenditures from specified sources collected or received by Oregon Military Department for The Dalles Readiness Center. Extends project approval and expenditure limitation for Oregon State Police for Oregon Wireless Interoperability network to June 30, 2014. Approves sale of property by Oregon Military Department. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Effective date, April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chapter 120, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith, Thatcher. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Hicks, Weidner; Excused, 2--Conger, Thompson. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2014-03-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-03-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, George. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)Amendments distributed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |