OR SB5701 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusts biennial allocations of lottery moneys from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund. Adjusts biennial allocations of lottery moneys from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund. Increases amount allocated to State Court Facilities and Security Account from Criminal Fine Account. Allocates lottery moneys from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to Oregon Business Development Department for Oregon Manufacturing Extension Partnership and port property redevelopment. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Effective date, April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chapter 109, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Hicks; Excused, 2--Conger, Thompson. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2014-03-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-03-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Johnson declared potential conflict of interest. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)Amendments distributed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |