OR SB558 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to convene work group to advise and assist in implementing targeted outreach and marketing for Health Care for All Oregon Children program. Permits all children residing in Oregon and meeting financial eligibility requirements to enroll in program. Requires authority, in collaboration with Department of Consumer and Business Services if necessary, to seek necessary federal approval or waiver of federal requirements to secure federal financial participation in costs of outreach and marketing and in expansion of eligibility for program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to improving the health of Oregon children; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Rep. John Huffman [R] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Sen. Brian Boquist [R] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | Senate | Effective date, August 2, 2017. |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Chapter 652, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-07 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2017-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 37; Nays, 23--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson. |
2017-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to July 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 8--DeBoer, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |