OR SB557 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes COFA Dental Program in Oregon Health Authority to provide dental care to low-income citizens of Pacific Islands in Compact of Free Association who reside in Oregon, qualify for medical assistance through Oregon Supplemental Income Program and lack access to affordable dental coverage. Establishes COFA Dental Program in Oregon Health Authority to provide dental care to low-income citizens of Pacific Islands in Compact of Free Association who reside in Oregon, qualify for medical assistance through Oregon Supplemental Income Program and lack access to affordable dental coverage. Specifies eligibility requirements for program and duties of authority in administering program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to dental care for Pacific Islanders legally residing in Oregon under the Compact of Free Association.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2021-03-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-17SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-08SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Health Care.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback