OR SB557 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals greenhouse gas emissions goals and requires Environmental Quality Commission to adopt by rule statewide greenhouse gas emissions goal for 2025, and limits for years 2035 and 2050. Requires Environmental Quality Commission to adopt carbon pollution market by rule. Requires commission to consult with certain interested persons and be advised by advisory committee in adopting rules. Establishes Greenhouse Gas Cap and Investment Program Oversight Committee. Provides for minimum requirements of carbon pollution market. Declares legislative purposes of carbon pollution market. Establishes Climate Investments Account within State Highway Fund. Requires that certain auction proceeds be deposited in account for purpose of funding programs consistent with legislative purposes of carbon pollution market. Establishes Oregon Climate Investments Fund. Requires that certain auction proceeds be deposited in fund, to be distributed through Climate Investments Grant Program adopted by Environmental Quality Commission by rule. Creates Climate Investments in Disadvantaged Communities Advisory Committee. Requires committee to advise on distributions of certain auction proceeds. Establishes Just Transition Fund. Requires that certain auction proceeds be deposited in fund, to be distributed through Just Transition Grant Program adopted by Oregon Business Development Department by rule. Makes all provisions related to carbon pollution market and distribution of auction proceeds operative January 1, 2021. Authorizes Environmental Quality Commission, Public Utility Commission and Oregon Business Development Department to adopt rules prior to operative date. Requires registration and reporting by certain sources of greenhouse gas emissions. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Changes name of Oregon Global Warming Commission to Oregon Commission on Climate Change. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to entities that contribute to greenhouse gas emissions; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-04-14SenateRecommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and rescind referral to Ways and Means and refer to Rules. Referral to Ways and Means rescinded and referred to Business and Transportation by Order of the President.
2017-04-12SenateWork Session held.
2017-03-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback