OR SB557 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies scope of justifiable use of physical force for purposes of criminal prosecution. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the use of physical force; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB557 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB557/Introduced |