OR SB5561 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Effective date, December 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Effective date, December 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to specified state agencies for specified expenses. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to specified state agencies for specified expenses. Modifies certain biennial appropriations made from General Fund to specified state agencies. Limits biennial expenditures from specified moneys collected or received by specified state agencies. Modifies limitations on expenditures for certain biennial expenses for specified state agencies. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-17 | Senate | Effective date, December 14, 2021. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Chapter 4, 2021 Laws. |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-12-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-12-13 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 3--Bonham, Reschke, Stark; Excused, 5--Goodwin, Scharf, Wilde, Williams, Zika. |
2021-12-13 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2021-12-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to The Second Special Session of 2021. |
2021-12-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Knopp declared potential conflict of interest. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Referred to The Second Special Session of 2021. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |