OR SB556 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that on-site inspections must be in person for health care facilities, home health agencies, residential care facilities, adult foster homes, hospice programs and qualified residential treatment programs. Specifies that on-site inspections must be in person for child-caring agencies, proctor foster homes, private residential boarding schools, foster homes, youth offender foster homes,] health care facilities, home health agencies, residential care facilities, adult foster homes, developmental disability child foster homes,] hospice programs and qualified residential treatment programs. Authorizes Governor by executive order to allow online inspections during period of statewide emergency. Allows licenses, certificates or other authorizations to be extended for up to six months during period of statewide emergency. After six months, prohibits renewal of licenses, certificates or other authorizations without in-person site inspection.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to in-person inspections; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, June 15, 2021. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 338, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Ruiz. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Drazan, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Gelser. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Motion to refer to Committee on Ways and Means failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 17--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |