OR SB5539 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Effective date, August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Effective date, August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Watershed Enhancement Board to allocate moneys from Watershed Conservation Operating Fund to various state agencies to implement Article XV, section 4b, of Oregon Constitution. Limits biennial expenditures by board from federal funds and lottery funds. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by board. Directs board to establish by rule process for allocating available moneys in Natural Resources Subaccount of Parks and Natural Resources Fund. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Watershed Enhancement Board; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | Senate | Effective date, August 9, 2019. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Chapter 696, 2019 Laws. |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 4--Helm, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 7--Clem, Greenlick, Hernandez, McKeown, Noble, Smith DB, Wallan. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Steiner Hayward. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |