OR SB5539 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-30 - Effective date, July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-30 - Effective date, July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Secretary of State for certain biennial expenses.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Secretary of State; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-30 | Senate | Effective date, July 25, 2013. |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Chapter 671, 2013 Laws. |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 8--Conger, Freeman, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Parrish, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McLane. |
2013-06-28 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Kruse, Thomsen; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |