OR SB5534 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Public Utility Commission of Oregon. Limits biennial expenditures by commission from federal funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Public Utility Commission of Oregon; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2019. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 185, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 6--Barreto, Nearman, Reschke, Smith DB, Wallan, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Williamson. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 7, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 6, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |