OR SB5525 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Effective date, July 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Effective date, July 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by Oregon Board of Naturopathic Medicine. Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by Oregon Board of Naturopathic Medicine. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Board of Naturopathic Medicine; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2021. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Chapter 436, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 14--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Morgan, Owens, Post, Stark, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Moore-Green, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Boshart Davis, Drazan, Holvey. |
2021-06-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-08 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Kennemer. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |