OR SB552 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to convene advisory group to study media program standards developed by State Board of Education and to report results of study to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education. Directs Department of Education to convene advisory group to study media program standards developed by State Board of Education and to report results of study to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education. Sunsets December 31, 2021. Requires State Board of Education to consult with State Library when establishing any standards involving media programs. Encourages school districts and public charter schools to offer students courses or other instructional opportunities in information literacy. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to school media program standards; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB552 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB552/Introduced |