OR SB5517 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Legislative Administration Committee, Legislative Assembly, Legislative Counsel Committee, Legislative Fiscal Officer, Legislative Revenue Officer, Commission on Indian Services and Legislative Policy and Research Committee for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by certain legislative branch agencies. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of legislative branch agencies; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback