OR SB5513 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, June 28, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, June 28, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the financial administration of the State Department of Fish and Wildlife; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Department of Fish and Wildlife; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Effective date, June 28, 2011. | |
2011-06-30 | Chapter 573, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-29 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-22 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-17 | President signed. | |
2011-06-16 | Third reading. Carried by Jenson. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 11--Bentz, Brewer, Conger, Freeman, Johnson, Lindsay, Parrish, Thatcher, Thompson, Wand, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Berger, Tomei. | |
2011-06-15 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 16, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-14 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-13 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-06-10 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-06-09 | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Boquist, Ferrioli, George. | |
2011-06-08 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-07 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-06-03 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-26 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-05-26 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-04 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-30 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-29 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-28 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |