OR SB5512 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Effective date, August 8, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Housing and Community Services Department for biennial expenses and for debt service. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from certain lottery moneys. Limits biennial expenditures by department from other federal funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of the Housing and Community Services Department; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14SenateEffective date, August 8, 2019.
2019-08-14SenateChapter 642, 2019 Laws.
2019-08-08SenateGovernor signed.
2019-07-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 4--Barreto, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 7--Clem, Greenlick, Hernandez, McKeown, Noble, Smith DB, Wallan.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2019-06-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-29HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-29SenateVote explanation filed by Golden.
2019-06-29SenateKnopp declared potential conflict of interest.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Heard, Olsen, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-06-18SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-17SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-17SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-14SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2019-06-13SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-11SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-20SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback