OR SB543 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits food vendor from using polystyrene foam container in sales of prepared food. Prohibits food vendor from using polystyrene foam container in sales of prepared food. Prohibits food vendor from providing single-use foodware containers to consumer unless foodware containers meet certain criteria.] Prohibits person from selling or distributing polystyrene foam containers or polystyrene foam packaging peanuts. Prohibits person from selling or distributing foodware containers containing intentionally added perfluoroalkyl or polyfluoroalkyl substances. Prohibitions become operative January 1, 2025. Establishes civil penalties for violations. Directs Department of Environmental Quality to establish certification program for compostable products.].
Title
Relating to prohibitions for certain products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2024. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 73, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-05-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 18--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 1--Javadi; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2023-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-04-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-04-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-12 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2023-04-07 | House | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment. |
2023-04-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Robinson. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 9--Bonham, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Carried over to 04-03 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Carried over to 03-30 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Carried over to 03-29 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |