OR SB542 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals sections of Ballot Measure 91 (2014) that prescribe manner in which local governments may regulate production, processing, wholesale sale, retail sale and taxation of marijuana. Specifies that provisions of Ballot Measure 91 (2014) do not prohibit local governments from adopting ordinances that regulate, restrict, prohibit or impose taxes on production, processing, wholesale sale or retail sale of marijuana. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to local governments' regulation of marijuana; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-03-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-02-03SenateReferred to Implementing Measure 91.
2015-02-02SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback