OR SB540 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on School Capital Improvement Planning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public education facilities; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-21SenateEffective date, August 14, 2013.
2013-08-21SenateChapter 773, 2013 Laws.
2013-08-14SenateGovernor signed.
2013-07-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-07-15SenatePresident signed.
2013-07-07HouseThird reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 18--Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Jenson, Kennemer, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant.
2013-07-06HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2013-07-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2013-07-06HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2013-07-06HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2013-07-06SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 5--Ferrioli, George, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen.
2013-07-06SenateSecond reading.
2013-07-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2013-07-02SenateWork Session held.
2013-06-26SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2013-06-26SenateWork Session held.
2013-06-25SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2013-06-20SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2013-03-14SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2013-03-12SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-02-28SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-02-15SenateReferred to Education and Workforce Development, then Ways and Means.
2013-02-12SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback