OR SB535 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies child abuse reporting requirements to add hotelkeepers and innkeepers as mandatory reporters of child abuse. Modifies child abuse reporting requirements to add hotelkeepers and innkeepers as mandatory reporters of child abuse. Modifies requirement for processor of photographic images or computer technician to report visual recording of child involved in sexually explicit conduct. Punishes failure to report by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to mandatory reporting of child abuse.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] |
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-04-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Heard; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thomsen. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |