OR SB534 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local governments to allow single-family dwellings within urban growth boundary of city with population greater than 25,000 in residential lots platted and zoned for such uses. Requires local governments to allow single-family dwellings within urban growth boundary of city with population greater than 10,000] 25,000 in residential lots platted and zoned for such uses. Applies to dwelling unit applications filed on or after March 1, 2020.
Title
Relating to single-family dwellings in residential areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Herman Baertschiger [R] | Sen. Shemia Fagan [D] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Rules. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Rules. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 623, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Taylor. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 25; Nays, 2--Dembrow, Taylor; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilson. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 18--Barker, Doherty, Findley, Gorsek, Greenlick, Hernandez, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith G, Smith Warner, Sollman, Witt; Excused, 1--Clem. |
2019-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-30 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2019-05-30 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules. |
2019-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-04-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Heard, Baertschiger Jr. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Dembrow, Riley, Taylor; Excused, 2--Hass, Winters. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Housing. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |