OR SB527 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits member of Legislative Assembly from service on Joint Committee on Ways and Means, subcommittee of Joint Committee on Ways and Means or Emergency Board if member, relative of member or business with which member or relative is associated enters into contracts with State of Oregon for provision of goods or services to state, including capital construction. Prohibits member of Legislative Assembly from service on Joint Committee on Ways and Means, subcommittee of Joint Committee on Ways and Means or Emergency Board if member, relative of member or business with which member or relative is associated enters into contracts with State of Oregon for provision of goods or services to state, including capital construction. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to qualifications for service on legislative budget committees; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB527 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB527/Introduced |