OR SB523 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Revenue to make publicly available by posting online information about delinquent tax debtors. Applies to all liquidated and delinquent tax debt owed to state on or after effective date of Act and to all tax periods for which tax debt is delinquent. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to notification of public about delinquent tax debtors; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 336, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 19--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Bynum, Fahey, Gorsek, Hayden, Helt, Hernandez, McLane, Meek, Nosse, Reschke, Salinas, Sanchez, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Williamson, Wilson; Excused, 3--Barreto, Boshart Davis, McKeown. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 2--Girod, Linthicum. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |