OR SB521 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective date, June 11, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Permits coach to allow member of school athletic team and nonschool athletic team to participate in athletic event or training at any time after athletic trainer determines that member has not suffered concussion. Allows athletic trainer to consult with health care professional in making determination whether member suffered concussion. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to concussions; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-15SenateEffective date, June 11, 2015.
2015-06-15SenateChapter 392, 2015 Laws.
2015-06-11SenateGovernor signed.
2015-06-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-06-04SenatePresident signed.
2015-06-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Komp; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2015-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2015 Calendar.
2015-05-29HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2015 Calendar.
2015-05-28HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2015 Calendar.
2015-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2015 Calendar.
2015-05-26HouseSecond reading.
2015-05-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-05-20HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-05-15HousePublic Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
2015-05-08HousePublic Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
2015-04-14HouseReferred to Health Care.
2015-04-08HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-04-07SenateThird reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2015-04-06SenateSecond reading.
2015-04-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-03-31SenateWork Session held.
2015-03-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-02-03SenateReferred to Education.
2015-02-02SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback