OR SB518 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs State Board of Pharmacy to conduct study for purpose of determining whether plant mitragyna speciosa and drug derivatives of plant should be scheduled as controlled substance. Sunsets January 2, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to kratom; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback