OR SB518 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Department of State Lands.
Title
Relating to Department of State Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Effective date, January 1, 2012. | |
2011-06-30 | Chapter 559, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-29 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-22 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-16 | President signed. | |
2011-06-15 | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 23; nays, 6--Boquist, Ferrioli, Olsen, Telfer, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Johnson. | |
2011-06-08 | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Thatcher; Excused, 1--Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Berger, Jenson, Tomei. | |
2011-06-07 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-03 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-05-31 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-26 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to Energy, Environment and Water. | |
2011-04-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 17; nays, 12--Ferrioli, George, Johnson, Kruse, Morse, Nelson, Olsen, Telfer, Thomsen, Verger, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Girod. | |
2011-04-06 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-06 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-03-31 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-10 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |